MIDDLESBROUGH GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 514482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We operate in Middlesbrough. we run a social club for people with a learning disability from ages 16 upwards. .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £4,752
Total expenditure: £5,863

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Middlesbrough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MIDDLESBROUGH MENCAP SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • MIDDLESBROUGH MENCAP SOCIETY AND GATEWAY (Previous name)
  • MIDDLESBROUGH SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEORGE WILLIAM SMITH Chair
None on record
Robert Mathewman Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
DEBRA SELLERS secretary Trustee
None on record
TRUDY GRIFFITHS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £5.43k £2.67k £0 £4.80k £4.75k
Total expenditure £8.38k £5.90k £0 £4.75k £5.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O THE ORCHARD
HOLYROOD ROAD
LONGLANDS
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS4 2QT
Phone:
01642246610
Email:
No information available