Financial history ROSSENDALE RESPONSIBLE ANIMAL RESCUE (RRAR)

Charity number: 1185370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £59.95k £104.03k £81.85k £82.17k £106.47k
Total expenditure £55.31k £72.47k £71.27k £86.97k £76.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A