ROHINGYA ACTION NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One of RANE's main objective is to continue with the political campaign, to raise public awareness. We organise demonstrations/rallies and public meetings with local, national and international politicians and government ministers to raise the Rohingya Refugee crisis. RANE actively seeks donations to continue to provide aid work at the refugee camp providing vital essentials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- RANE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Habibur Rahman | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amad Ali | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Latifa Miah | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rashida Ahmed | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nosima Khatun Rahman | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shahida Uddin | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Farhana Ahmed | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHILIP BOWMAN | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
WASIM MOHAMMED | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Ann Veronica Schofield | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Sorwar Ahmed | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £699 | £194 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £2.50k | £4.12k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE ROHINGYA PEOPLE OF MYANMAR (BURMA) LIVING IN COX'S BAZAR REFUGEE CAMP IN BANGLADESH THROUGH: A) PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, SERVICES, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEEDS AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE NEED; B) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE ROHINGYA PEOPLE LIVING IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND, WHO ARE SEEKING ASYLUM OR HAVE BEEN GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS THROUGH SIGNPOSTING TO ANY RELEVANT INFORMATION AND ADVISORY SERVICES/ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE SUPPORT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE ROHINGYA PEOPLE BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 SCEPTRE STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 6PR
- Phone:
- 07872608987
- Email:
- info@rane.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window