Audley Male Voice Choir

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the choir is to give concerts to raise funds for a range of organisations in the area. Two of the concerts are major events one of which enables us to support a very worthwhile organisation with a donation. The recipient body changes from year to year. The choir also provides an annual bursary to a Keele University music student.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 November 1983: Standard registration
- AUDLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR (Working name)
- AUDLEY AND DISTRICT MALE VOICE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Johnson | Chair | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hewitt | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Griffiths | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Greg Walker | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Munro | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Smith | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deric Cotterill | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Williamson | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM STUART SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALLAN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.40k | £14.97k | £22.22k | £16.12k | £18.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.85k | £14.32k | £23.40k | £14.74k | £17.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 5 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1991. as amended on 29 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Rutland Close
CONGLETON
Cheshire
CW12 1LT
- Phone:
- 0784 907 3224
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window