ART FRIENDS CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities advance the education of the public in the visual arts and architecture, culture and heritage through a programme of lectures, study sessions and visits to places of historic, architectural and cultural interest, museums and galleries. They also advance arts, culture and heritage by making grants to projects that promote arts, culture and heritage for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 April 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Way MA Cantab | Chair | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Hubert Medland MA Cantab | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Campbell Lowson | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Keith MPhil | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Josselyn | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | £8.66k | £15.19k | £14.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.27k | £6.05k | £11.41k | £16.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 31 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF ART, CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY PROVIDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LECTURES, WORKSHOPS, TOURS AND OTHER EVENTS AT MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND SITES (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY MAKING GRANTS TO PROJECTS, MUSEUMS OR GALLERIES THAT PROMOTE THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 CAMBRIDGE PLACE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1NS
- Phone:
- 01223721916
- Email:
- jmjosselyn@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window