THE CHURCH OF THE ASCENSION PARISH HALL CHARITY, HALL GREEN, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates Parish Halls on the site of the Church of the Ascension, Hall Green, Birmingham. These provides space, open 7 days a week, where activities can take place to benefit: 1. Those in need by reason of age, disability, ill health and financial hardship 2. Those suffering hardships through family separation 3. The whole community through recreation and leisure facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 28 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parochial Church Council of the Church of the Ascension, Hall Green | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.37k | £19.74k | £46.67k | £51.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.96k | £20.34k | £33.93k | £77.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE ASCENSION, HALL GREEN, BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93b School Road
Hall Green
Birmingham
B28 8JQ
- Phone:
- 01217773689
- Email:
- admin@ascensionhallgreen.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window