CRAVEN AND KEIGHLEY AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS)IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activities of the charity is the furtherance of the general religious and charitable purposes of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) in Britain in the area pf Craven District and Keighley Town Council areas and beyond. The charity owns and maintains 5 Quaker Meeting Houses and 1 closed burial ground and 2 open burial grounds. The charity operates a Bunk Barn at Airton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 August 2019: Standard registration
- CRAVEN AND KEIGHLEY AREA QUAKER MEETING (Working name)
- CRAVEN AND KEIGHLEY AREA MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS)IN BRITAIN (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER NORMAN GASCOINE HART | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Marie-Therese Lebacq | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Scarborough | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Milburn Penaluna | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Peart | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Weinhold | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Erica R Cadbury | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.57k | £129.85k | £113.53k | £102.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.28k | £67.77k | £135.67k | £115.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.10k | £1.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA CRAVEN AND KEIGHLEY AREA MEETING AND BEYOND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends Meeting House
THE GINNEL
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 2JA
- Phone:
- 01535647151
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window