Accounts and annual returns CROSSING THE GAIN LINE

Charity number: 1186872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 April 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 11 April 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 06 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window