Cosy hall Community Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall. Provides venue for a variety of sporting, social and cultural activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 14 November 1983: Standard registration
- COSY HALL (Working name)
- NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE (COSY HALL) VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Wiggin | Chair | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Paul Anthony Crewe | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Berrow | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Wiggin | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Jan Sterling | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Cannon | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MARION WYNN | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|||||
TONY FORRESTER | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY RICHARD BENTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DERRICK CLANCY | Trustee |
|
||||||
GODFREY BRYAN SPURR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MILES MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.35k | £20.80k | £47.08k | £31.13k | £44.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.42k | £45.31k | £26.28k | £38.43k | £45.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £25.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £14.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1983 as amended on 31 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWPORT IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE ARE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FO LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WATER LANE
NEWPORT
SHROPSHIRE
TF10 7LD
- Phone:
- 01952417598
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window