NW LIVE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dedicated to bringing communities together, NW Live Arts produces professional cross-genre concerts in community/arts venues in London. We work with high calibre professional musicians and also collaborate with specialist partners to run creative community workshops exploring social themes that are central to the concert programme. Community participants are invited to perform in the concert.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 24 September 2019: Standard registration
- NW LIVE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danai Gertrude Nombulelo Ngangira | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Ransby | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martha Okigbo | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Hill | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Virendra Shenai | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.68k | £55.44k | £33.76k | £85.19k | £86.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.56k | £47.12k | £28.71k | £75.38k | £107.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO HOLD AND APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, LITERATURE AND DANCE BY MEANS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) ORGANISING PUBLIC CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, TALKS, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EVENTS PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTH AND NORTH WEST LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 LAWFORD ROAD
LONDON
NW5 2LG
- Phone:
- 07900481203
- Email:
- info@nwlivearts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window