THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ROCK OF REDEMPTION REHOBOTH PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rccg rock of redemption Rehoboth Parish is based in south east London and many activities are on this Premises, Planet Nollywood 319 Camberwell road, London SE5 OHQ .The church activities cover some parts of Camberwell ,Elephant & Castle and Brixton . We organise events for teens/youths to discuss gang culture once a month . We visit elderly/homeless people and offer financial support .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 30 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Maloba Magero | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Magero | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Maloba | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benson Muthee Gitau | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £5.96k | £29.75k | £12.48k | £32.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £6.59k | £29.02k | £13.37k | £25.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Victoria House
Durham Avenue
ROMFORD
RM2 6JL
- Phone:
- 07459390991
- Email:
- francis_maloba@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window