CLIMATE ED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Climate Ed provide high quality carbon literacy education to children across the UK and enables them, their families and communities to reduce their carbon emissions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robert Morgan | Chair | 06 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Angharad Knill | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ian Quick | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alexander Blackett | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hoa Phuong Doan | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harrison | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lily Keyzor | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Ellen Airey | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £19.66k | £66.42k | £42.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £661 | £11.37k | £35.83k | £44.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.88k | £7.94k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 18 AND UNDER, IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO CLIMATE SCIENCE, GLOBAL WARMING AND WAYS TO PREVENT OR REDUCE THE IMPACTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 18 AND UNDER WITH INFORMATION AND INSTRUCTION ABOUT CLIMATE SCIENCE AND GLOBAL WARMING AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO FIND WAYS TO PREVENT OR REDUCE THE IMPACTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 BESLEY STREET
LONDON
SW16 6BD
- Phone:
- 07954338218
- Email:
- contact@climateed.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window