VOLUNTARY ACTION COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Action Coventry exists to promote and support social action, volunteering and community resilience in Coventry, strengthening communities, building capability and improving quality of life for residents in the city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£721,257
Donations and legacies | £1.10k | |
Charitable activities | £696.78k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £20.10k | |
Other | £3.28k |
Total expenditure:
£763,309
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £763.31k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £410,752 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £763.31k |
People

16 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Coventry City
Governance
- 08 December 1983: Standard registration
- 07 September 2019: Funds received from 1146365 VOLUNTARY SECTOR CONSORTIUM
- C V S C (Working name)
- COVENTRY 4 GOOD (Working name)
- COVENTRY VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- COVENTRY VOLUNTARY SERVICE COUNCIL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Jane Batchelor | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Weare | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sherril Donaldson | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
BHOVINDER NAGRA | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Christine Carroll | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £537.68k | £619.29k | £715.98k | £665.72k | £721.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £547.40k | £533.67k | £615.11k | £659.32k | £763.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £227.15k | £271.16k | £261.00k | £261.00k | £410.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £500 | £1.00k | £5.50k | £1.10k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £478.53k | £613.23k | £691.14k | £634.17k | £696.78k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £32.87k | £2.61k | £21.73k | £19.03k | £20.10k | |
|
Income - Other | £26.28k | £2.94k | £2.10k | £7.02k | £3.28k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £547.40k | £533.67k | £615.11k | £659.32k | £763.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.54k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.40k | £1.03k | £0 | £0 | £4.25k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £275.70k | £328.34k | £437.75k | £357.31k | £326.59k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £169.20k | £134.85k | £142.35k | £55.52k | £71.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JANUARY 1998, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2000 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAY 2001 AND 27 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 19 Jun 2019 as amended on 17 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
The advancement of citizenship and community development undertaken through the provision of development support in Coventry to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and social enterprises; increasing the effective use of charitable and non-profit resources by building the capacity of individuals and organisations through the promotion of volunteering and the voluntary sector to take positive action in their community for public benefit. The relief of those in need in Coventry, by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage through the identification of existing and emerging individual and community needs and the development or support of voluntary sector led solutions to alleviate those needs ensuring those in need benefit from improved access to services which can better met their immediate and long term requirements. The advancement of education through the provision of information and delivery of programmes of training which improve the efficiency and effectiveness of charities or social enterprises, increase the employability of individuals and enhance the ability of organisation to contribute positively to the development of solutions to meet defined needs in their community for public benefit. The advancement of health and the saving of lives in Coventry through the promotion of voluntary and social enterprise sectors activities that have a proven benefit improving health and wellbeing, whilst promoting best practice and ensuring individuals are in involved in health service design and delivery for wider public benefit.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
Harp Place
2 Sandy Lane
Coventry
- Phone:
- 02476220381
- Email:
- info@vacoventry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window