ZOO CO CREATIVE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Zoo Co are an award-winning Croydon based arts organisation who create high quality, accessible theatre and creative engagement for young people. Accessibility is at the core of Zoo Co's work and they are driven to breaking down barriers to theatre that people may face, be they financial or physical. Zoo Co believe theatre is better when everyone has a seat at the table.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£563,197
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £466.24k | |
Other trading activities | £19.16k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £77.80k |
Total expenditure:
£460,484
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £460.48k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £38,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £460.48k | |
Retained for future use | £102.71k |
People

5 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 November 2019: Standard registration
- ZOO CO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Claughton | Chair | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Folarin Ayomide Akinmade | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Clare Pearce | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James David Sweeting | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bellwood | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Dickson | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lawrence Stephenson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Che Ramsden | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.14k | £151.53k | £201.75k | £347.49k | £563.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.50k | £138.25k | £203.91k | £352.47k | £460.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £2.17k | £30.37k | £200.61k | £38.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.16k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £466.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £77.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £460.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £217.76k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £66.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (1) PRESENTATION OF PERFORMANCES AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW WORK; (2) DEVELOPING ACCESSIBILITY IN THE ARTS THROUGH INNOVATIVE, TAILORED ENGAGEMENT PROGRAMMES FOR MARGINALISED GROUPS OR INDIVIDUALS IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 7-21 AND D/DEAF AND DISABLED AUDIENCES/PARTICIPANTS; (3) THE PROVISION OF A THEATRE AND OTHER PERFORMANCE SPACES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanley Arts
12 South Norwood Hill
LONDON
SE25 6AB
- Phone:
- 07394055476
- Email:
- florence@wearezooco.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window