THE ANITA MENDIRATTA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity will work with partner organisations which meet its due diligence requirements in order to provide this support on the ground. Local organisations providing education, safe childcare, health and wellbeing, supplemental school programmes, infrastructure and other initiatives enabling children and families to rebuild their lives will be supported through grant-funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
- Angola
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Belize
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Central African Republic
- Chile
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Ethiopia
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Martinique
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Mongolia
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Rwanda
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Syria
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkmenistan
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 September 2019: CIO registration
- AMF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Mendiratta | Chair | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Elliot Merschen | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cheryl James-Ward | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Walsh | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/06/2020 | 17/09/2021 | 17/09/2022 | 17/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £101.14k | £13.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £8.52k | £24.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OURY CLARK SOLICITORS
10 JOHN STREET
LONDON
WC1N 2EB
- Phone:
- 07557818030
- Email:
- AMF@anitamendiratta.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window