Accounts and annual returns THE HELENA TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1185404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 04 November 2024 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 04 November 2024 340 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 27 June 2023 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 27 June 2023 209 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window