THE CHARITY EXCELLENCE FRAMEWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a digital and AI eco system, which is a free, simple to use one-stop-shop that enables any UK non profit to find the funding, and free help and resources it needs. It also has the Charity Sector Data Store, which has created Big Data for the sector to support sector decision making. We prioritise support for small charities and marginalised groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Shawdon | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Rachelle Mann | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SWAYSLAND | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Davies | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.37k | £62.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.37k | £12.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 August 2024 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 April 2025 | 604 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO AN ONLINE TOOLKIT AND ITS DATA STORE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BLACKMORE GATE
BUCKLAND
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 5JT
- Phone:
- 07595371444
- Email:
- ian@charityexcellence.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window