Accounts and annual returns CORNWALL CHESS TRUST

Charity number: 1186792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 21 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 May 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required