Financial history CORNWALL CHESS TRUST

Charity number: 1186792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £133.47k £3.20k £3.80k £5.41k
Total expenditure £0 £307 £1.84k £2.80k £4.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A