CORNWALL CHESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to people or organisations for the purpose of promoting the playing and study of chess in the county of Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Frances Constable | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Percy Thomas Paul Gill | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian George | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Retallick | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Francis Gough Kneebone | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £133.47k | £3.20k | £3.80k | £5.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £307 | £1.84k | £2.80k | £4.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS OF MONEY AND BY OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHESS IN ALL ITS FORMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND PERSONS IN ATTENDANCE AT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TEACHING, DEVELOPMENT AND SUPERVISION OF THE PLAYING OF CHESS IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE NEW TO CHESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3a Roskear
CAMBORNE
TR14 8DF
- Phone:
- 01209719727
- Email:
- 3a.roskear@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window