THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BIRCHWOOD AND WOOLSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of the Parish of Birchwood and Woolston, have the responsibility, of cooperating with the Vicar of the Parish or visiting clergy whilst in an Interregnum, of promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. Full details of current activities are included in our Annual Report.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 09 October 2019: Standard registration
- CHURCH OF THE ASCENSION - WOOLSTON (PARISH CHURCH) (Working name)
- CHURCH OF THE TRANSFIGURATION - BIRCHWOOD (WORSHIP CENTRE) (Working name)
- THE TABLE, OAKWOOD (MISSION OUTREACH) (Working name)
- THE UNITED PARISH OF BIRCHWOOD AND WOOLSTON (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tabitha Prabhakara Rao | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Taylor | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Woolley | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Margaret Clegg | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Kelly | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara England | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Laugher | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Walsh | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil David Fairweather BSc, MSc | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Ann Simpson | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Eric Dibben | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.46k | £144.99k | £93.21k | £73.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.90k | £157.97k | £91.80k | £75.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WARREN LANE
WOOLSTON
WARRINGTON
WA1 4ES
- Phone:
- 01925852406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window