CROESERW ATHLETIC FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have provided opportunities for the playing of football and keeping active in the local community through 2 senior football teams and 5 junior teams. This is in a safe and accessible environment and also affordable for all to participate. Also taking part in wider community activities and providing opportunities for members of the community to come together and socialise and also learn new
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 18 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Atyeo | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Joshua | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Jones | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hitesh Patel | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Connor Thomas | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA TRAHAR | Trustee | 18 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.83k | £30.47k | £50.64k | £87.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.79k | £32.77k | £43.60k | £127.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 July 2022 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CROESERW AND SURROUNDING AREAS PRIMARILY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tudor Park
Croeserw
SA13 3SD
- Phone:
- 07792106303
- Email:
- croeserwathleticfc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window