THE FRIENDS OF WOOLHOPE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to maintain the building and churchyard of St George's Woolhope in good repair
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 11 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Brewer | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Vakatalai | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian Margaret Crozier | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Hadley | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Fox | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32k | £6.50k | £3.60k | £2.91k | £4.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.79k | £4.56k | £1.04k | £4.26k | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN IN GOOD REPAIR, AND JUDICIOUSLY ENHANCE, THE FABRIC, MONUMENTS, FIXTURES AND FITTINGS OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD, WOOLHOPE, AND TO GENERATE INCOME FOR THIS PURPOSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOOPERS OAK
WOOLHOPE
HEREFORD
HR1 4RQ
- Phone:
- 07789 598 715
- Email:
- barbara.fox54@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
woolhope.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window