THE STAITHES MUSEUM AND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Harry Linley | Chair | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Denise Glen Ambrosini | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Glyn Williams | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Lake | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Clifford Pyrah | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Clive Milnes | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Hawley | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.92k | £67.79k | £97.37k | £53.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.68k | £66.80k | £91.09k | £61.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE A. CONSERVE AND PRESERVE THE CONTENTS OF CAPTAIN COOK AND STAITHES HERITAGE CENTRE COLLECTION. B. PROMOTE THE CULTURAL HERITAGE , HISTORY AND ART WITHIN THE COLLECTION THROUGH EDUCATION AND LEARNING, ENABLING ACCESS FOR ALL TO THE COLLECTION WHERE PRACTICABLE. C. ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT COMMUNITY LIFE AND YOUTH INVOLVEMENT THROUGH VOLUNTEERING. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Staithes Museum and Heritage Trust
HIGH STREET
STAITHES
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS13 5BQ
- Phone:
- 01947841029
- Email:
- Dave.linley@aol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window