BROXBOURNE ARTS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Broxbourne Arts Forum supplements the Borough's own programme of events by providing concerts, plays, operas which would not otherwise be performed. We engage a pianist at lunchtimes in the Spotlight Bar. We organise watercolour classes for local residents and we promote local artists' work by arranging displays. We also act as an umbrella organisation for arts groups within the Borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,281 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 March 2020: CIO registration
- BARTS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Malcolm Gordon | Chair | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marguerita Hutchinson | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEONE JEANNE RAYNER | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|||||
John Martin Elson | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|||||
HILARY FIONA BURKE MARSH | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Phyllis Broad | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £5.90k | £10.93k | £15.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £3.87k | £8.64k | £15.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £600 | £2.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FOSTERING AND PROMOTING, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 WARNERS AVENUE
HODDESDON
EN11 8LR
- Phone:
- 01992466627
- Email:
- Info@broxbournearts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window