THE FURTHER FASTER NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Further Faster Network meets its charitable purpose primarily by offering coaching, community and content for the leaders of churches who want to grow their churches by creating churches that unchurched people love to attend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ANTHONY GALLAGHER | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Jamie Corcoran | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ronald Lane Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER PORTER | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Simpkins | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen James Fenning | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
REVEREND LEON ROBERT EVANS | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.52k | £61.74k | £87.04k | £205.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.95k | £46.38k | £75.51k | £116.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS BELIEF FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD, IN PARTICULAR BY HELPING TO CREATE CHURCHES UNCHURCHED PEOPLE LOVE TO BE PART OF IN EVERY COMMUNITY. THE CIO WILL DO THIS BY ESTABLISHING A NETWORK OF FOUNDER PARTNER CHRISTIAN CHURCHES WHO ARE ALIGNED AROUND THIS OBJECT, AND A PARTNER NETWORK OF AUTONOMOUS CHRISTIAN CHURCHES FOCUSED ON REACHING UNCHURCHED PEOPLE AND HELPING EACH OTHER GO FURTHER FASTER. THE CIO MAY ALSO ENGAGE IN OTHER ACTIVITIES TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS AGREED BY THE BOARD FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FORGE CHURCH
THE OLD CHAPEL
FORWARD GREEN
STOWMARKET
IP14 5HP
- Phone:
- 01449710437
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window