ST. KOSTKA POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit in Polish language, culture, tradition and history, in particular, but not exclusively by: 1. Providing a supplementary school, St Kostka Polish Saturday School in High Wycombe, teaching about Poland, the Polish language, history, geography, customs and traditions and providing religious education, and; 2. Organising educational trips for pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 June 2020: CIO registration
- POLSKA SZKOLA SOBOTNIA IM SW STANISLAWA KOSTKI (Working name)
- POLSKA SZKOLA PRZEDMIOTOW OJCZYSTYCH IM SW ST KOSTKI W HIGH WYCOMBE (Previous name)
- ST STANISLAUS KOSTKA POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AGNIESZKA WOJTOWICZ | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mariola Andrzejaczek | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Agata Cydzik | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.28k | £13.31k | £15.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.03k | £14.17k | £15.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN POLISH LANGUAGE, CULTURE, RELIGION AND TRADITION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL, ST. KOSTKA POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN HIGH WYCOMBE, TEACHING ABOUT POLAND, THE POLISH LANGUAGE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS AND PROVIDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, AND; B) ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL TRIPS FOR PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 HINTON CLOSE
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP13 5EG
- Phone:
- 07973539322
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window