CLYBIAU FFERMWYR IFANC SIR GAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth movement that provide opportunities to 700 members between the ages of 10 and 26 in Carmarthenshire. The movement offers opportunities and special experiences for the members as they develop new skills, receive valuable training, travel the world, become an integral part of the community and have the opportunity to make friends for life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £7,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

72 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 20 September 2019: CIO registration
- 21 June 2023: Funds received from 524031 CARMARTHENSHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS
- C.FF.I SIR GAR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
72 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gethin John Jones | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Gerwyn Sirell Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rose Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Jane Anne James Lewis | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eiry Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hefin Thomas Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Llinos Elin Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gethin Thomas Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Louise Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
IESTYN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Elin Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elliw Celyn Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Howard Roderick Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carys Miriam Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaretta Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carwen Ann Richards | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN ELFYN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
GETHIN TOBIAS THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon David Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Ceri Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Marie Langabeer | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sion Goodman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Phillips | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwenann Mair Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Windsor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Mair Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Gwawr Ann Lewis | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carys Ann Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MANSEL CHARLES | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Anne Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hefin John Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Lydia Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jack Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Mai Isaac | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Stuart Robbins | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Ann Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Hywel Rhys Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carys Lewis Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eiddwen Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elonwy Phillips | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Windsor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Andree Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Wynne Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aled Iwan Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nelian Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elin Mair Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Betsan Elinor Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham David James | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mererid Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Ann Parry Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Mary Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel William Owen Irving | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Angharad Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owain Benjamin Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cerys Megan Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aled Wyn Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Menna Wyn Isaac | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Hana Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iestyn Owen | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mared Lois Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Ryan Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rheinallt Llewelyn Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Margaret-Haf Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Medi Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Thomas James | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ruth Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carys Ann Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Mair John | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annie Eryl Mary Harries | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.82k | £61.37k | £86.08k | £111.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.68k | £61.99k | £84.43k | £134.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.43k | £22.36k | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, RURAL LIFE AND AFFAIRS, INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING, HOME CRAFTS, THE ENVIRONMENT AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS, TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES, WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, HEALTH AND WELLBEING, RAISE AWARENESS, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP AS INDIVIDUALS INTO FULL CITIZENS. C) TO PROMOTE ITS ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE MEDIUMS OF WELSH AND ENGLISH AND TO ENSURE THOSE ACTIVITIES ENHANCE THE MEMBERS UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF WELSH RURAL LIFE, WELSH CULTURE AND THE WELSH LANGUAGE, ALONG WITH PROVIDING AN UNDERSTANDING OF OTHER CULTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young Farmers Club
Agricultural House
32 Cambrian Place
Carmarthen
SA31 1QG
- Phone:
- 01267237693
- Email:
- sir.gar@yfc-wales.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window