RAFA MARHAM BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAF Marham RAFA Branch is an affiliated branch of the wider National Royal Airforce Association. We support serving personnel and families, veterans and families through direct welfare and wellbeing support at a local level.. We actively raise funds for the Annual RAFA Wings Appeal who support the wider RAF Family across the UK and beyond. All active members are solely volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stewart Anthony Geary | Chair | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karon Robinson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cpl Jeremy Goodman | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lund | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edwards | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.96k | £9.47k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £4.11k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 16 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE, THROUGH THE COMRADESHIP ENGENDERED BY ITS MEMBERS, THE WELFARE BY CHARITABLE MEANS OF ALL SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF OUR AIR FORCES, THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDANTS, TOGETHER WITH THE WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS OF THOSE WHO DIED WHILST SERVING OR SUBSEQUENTLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Air Force
Marham
King's Lynn
PE33 9NP
- Phone:
- 01760337261
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window