NORTHFIELDS COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will be providing a Community Managed Library run by trained volunteers from the local community. We will offer a traditional library service as well as developing other activities and events for all age ranges creating a community hub for independent learning, recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 25 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Meena Laljibhai Shah | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Joy Doyle | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Maureen Elizabeth Boughton | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Angela Margaret Bell | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Tanya White | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Willoughby | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Pegg | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Paul Driscoll | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05k | £35.61k | £21.23k | £29.67k | £38.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £384 | £4.60k | £13.10k | £18.09k | £24.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.67k | £20.00k | £22.50k | £21.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NORTHFIELDS WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND ADJOINING NEIGHBOURHOODS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY SERVICE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR INDEPENDENT LEARNING, RECREATION, AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR ALL RESIDENTS AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN, YOUNG AND OLDER PEOPLE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A LENDING LIBRARY AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE LIBRARY FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
255A Northfield Avenue
LONDON
W5 4UA
- Phone:
- 02085689027
- Email:
- getintouchncl@outlook.com
- Website:
-
northfieldscommunitylibrary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window