BIBLE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES

Charity Number: 1186004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to advance the Christian faith by publishing the distributing Bible courses for children and adults, and providing guidance and training to groups which use them. The courses are called Bibletime, Gleaners, and NewLife. We operate in the UK, but the courses are used in many countries around the world, either via the supply of printed copies, or by free download from our website.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £384,558
Total expenditure: £323,408

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 2019: CIO registration
  • 13 October 2021: Funds received from 1096157 BIBLE EDUCATIONAL SERVICES
  • 14 November 2024: Funds received from 1149117 CHORLEY GOSPEL HALL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Lorraine Rainey Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
DERRETT JAMES WATTS Trustee 29 September 2020
RENEWAL NORTH WEST
Received: On time
PARK EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
Pamela Harknett Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
STUART JOHN PRICE Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
ALLISON MARGARET JANE HILL Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
SAMUEL JAMES EDWARD BALMER Trustee 06 April 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £296.21k £286.93k £324.44k £384.56k
Total expenditure £225.71k £270.79k £315.67k £323.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37A BELMORE STREET
ENNISKILLEN
BT74 6AA
Phone:
02866322462