STUDLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
groups running child care, womens clubs, Line Dancing club, Cinema club, slimming club, Aerobic sessions, afternoon tea parties, Bingo sessions, Plays, theatrical shows, business Meetings, Private functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 November 1983: Standard registration
- 15 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STUDLEY VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.94k | £30.33k | £36.21k | £38.32k | £43.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.05k | £24.37k | £34.01k | £33.61k | £37.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 08 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 08 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 17 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 04 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUN E 1964
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STUDLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AS A PLACE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER OCCUPATIONS DURING LEISURE TIME AND/OR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STUDLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window