PIP PARENTS INFORMATION PORTAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting improvements in care for people who are affected by Poland Syndrome - Undertaking research into effects of Poland Syndrome and disseminating the useful results thereof - Increasing awareness of Poland Syndrome amongst health professionals and the general public - The provision of free advice and assistance to persons effected by Poland Syndrome and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 April 2020: CIO registration
- PIP-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Preston | Chair | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Walton | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josh Spiegel | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Bannister | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Erasmus | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.73k | £31.27k | £44.46k | £60.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £36.44k | £48.39k | £51.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2022 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2022 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE EFFECTED BY POLAND SYNDROME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: ·PROMOTING IMPROVEMENTS IN CARE FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE AFFECTED BY POLAND SYNDROME ·UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO EFFECTS OF POLAND SYNDROME AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF ·INCREASING AWARENESS OF POLAND SYNDROME AMONGST HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ·THE PROVISION OF FREE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS EFFECTED BY POLAND SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
School Court
Meyer Street
STOCKPORT
SK3 8JE
- Phone:
- 07708 209874
- Email:
- pip.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window