Accounts and annual returns GARDEN OF GRACE C & S CHURCH OF GOD
Charity number: 1185233

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2024 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 January 2023 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2022 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window