GARDEN OF GRACE C & S CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1185233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious operations and activities such as singing, praying, counselling (assisting those in need when and where possible)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £3,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bolaji Ruth Adewumi Chair 12 January 2017
None on record
Olououaliomi Samson Soulis Trustee 12 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.50k £28.95k £1.00k £1.00k
Total expenditure £18.82k £29.60k £3.00k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 November 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 June 2024 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 January 2023 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 January 2023 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2022 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
51 Teasel Crescent
LONDON
SE28 0LP
Phone:
07850578849
Website:

No information available