THE EXETER WEST GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group owns and maintains a large mechanical signal box from Exeter St. David's station. Fully restored to working order, the signal box is open to the public on a regular basis at the Crewe Heritage Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 24 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL RATCLIFF | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rupert Simon Nicholas Dyer | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy Law | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BARBER | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAOUL BEAMAN | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tony Thurgar | Trustee | 29 August 2009 |
|
|
||||
STEVE TULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.07k | £4.67k | £29.70k | £2.71k | £4.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | £1.18k | £4.42k | £4.76k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1983 AMENDED 26 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO SECURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, ENHANCEMENT USE AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS EXETER WEST SIGNAL BOX AND SIMILAR BUILDING OF HISTORIAL INTEREST AND TO USE THE SAID SIGNAL BOX AS A WORKING MUSEUM EXHIBITING ITEMS OF GENERAL RAILWAY INTEREST AND MORE PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO SIGNALLING HISTORY AND PRACTICE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winterbourne House
Caradoc Drive
Church Stretton
SY6 7AG
- Phone:
- 01694724422
- Email:
- contact@exeterwest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window