LIVE LUKE'S DREAMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the needs and wellbeing of children diagnosed with childhood cancer in the Enfield and Barnet area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Enfield
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Sawkins Mrs | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Salter Mrs | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Sawkins Mr | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £28.24k | £39.00k | £42.18k | £14.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £465 | £7.65k | £15.91k | £25.77k | £25.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2019 as amended on 30 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN DIAGNOSED WITH PAEDIATRIC CANCER, LIVING IN THE BARNET AND ENFIELD BOROUGHS, WHO ARE RECEIVING CANCER TREATMENT AT GREAT ORMOND STREET CHILDREN’S HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON HOSPITAL AND WHO ARE UNDER THE SHARED PAEDIATRIC ONCOLOGY CARE OF BARNET HOSPITAL, BY PROVIDING GIFTS IN HOSPITAL AND AT HOME, DAYS OUT AND FAMILY BREAKS AWAY DURING TREATMENT, FOR THE CHILD AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILY. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BEREAVED SIBLINGS AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE DIED FROM PAEDIATRIC CANCER, WHO WERE UNDER BARNET HOSPITAL'S PAEDIATRIC ONCOLOGY SHARED CARE, BY OFFERING REMEMBERANCE GIFTS AND DAYS OUT TO PROMOTE COMFORT AND ENHANCE THEIR WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 1404
ENFIELD
EN1 9HA
- Phone:
- 07308888046
- Email:
- hello@livelukesdreams.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window