THE PHOTO SPACE CHARITY CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We use photography to help people cope with mental or physical illness, loneliness, bereavement or social exclusion. Photography can be a lifeline. We help people to discover the joy, pleasure and wellbeing that photography offers. We work with agencies (such as NHS, GP Practices, MIND) to identify people we can help. Our base is a shop and tuition centre in Ludlow, South Shropshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- TPSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.66k | £15.13k | £8.53k | £8.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.39k | £12.70k | £11.51k | £10.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF PHOTOGRAPHY TUITION, EVENTS, WORKSHOPS, EXHIBITIONS, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES, INFORMATION, PROJECTS AND DISCUSSION GROUPS, AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window