HEADS TOGETHER PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of education and social inclusion through the arts. Helping young people to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society in particular through engagement in the arts. The provision of facilities for the benefits of the inhabitants of East Leeds. Training people in the area of arts activism across the north of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,745 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 March 2020: Standard registration
- CHAPEL FM (Working name)
- HEADS TOGETHER PRODUCTIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Margaret Bending | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Graham | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Turton | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Roger Billingham | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Bending | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Smickersgill | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Joshua Dixon | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Walker | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Toolan | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nobuhle Kweyama | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN JANE DYE | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wyndham George Pope | Trustee | 18 November 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.88k | £264.05k | £347.49k | £365.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.82k | £271.89k | £314.32k | £363.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £86.46k | £77.13k | £61.04k | £72.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING(BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ADVANCING THE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING IN RADIO BROADCASTING AND MEDIA SKILLS TECHNIQUES AND IN DESIGNING AND DELIVERING CREATIVE PROGRAMS OF WORK FOR INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES IN THE FIELDS OF PRINT, PHOTOGRAPHY, FILM, VIDEO, MUSIC, THEATRE, DANCE, RADIO AND MULTIMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES AND THEREBY SUPPORTING SUCH PEOPLE TO DEVELOP PROFESSIONAL AND LIFE SKILLS. 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION THROUGH THE ARTS, AND OTHER CULTURAL ACTIVITIES BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEED OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE “SOCIALLY EXCLUDED” MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: HEALTH, DISABILITY, UNEMPLOYMENT ,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT, YOUTH OR OLD AGE, DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT. 3.3 TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ENGAGEMENT IN THE ARTS 3.4 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EAST LEEDS, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR, RACE, GENDER, RELIGION OR BELIEF, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE .
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel FM Arts Centre
1081 York Road
Leeds
West Yorkshire
LS14 6JB
- Phone:
- 01132255944
- Email:
- info@headstogether.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window