SHERE SWIMMING POOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Shere Parish and the surrounding neighbourhood by the provision and maintenance of swimming facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Walker | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Daniel Anstey | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Harry Esplen | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bettina McLean | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Webster | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Skole Staunskjaer | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Hall | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Kingcome | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Lee Troughton | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Moggs | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Antony Clive Stevens C.Eng | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.66k | £61.82k | £77.66k | £85.54k | £58.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.12k | £36.21k | £135.92k | £102.86k | £67.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | £14.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Aug 2019 as amended on 30 Sep 2021 as amended on 22 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Shere Parish and the surrounding neighbourhood, by the provision and maintenance of swimming facilities, as well as facilitating the provision of swimming activities and support services.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trenchmore
Shere Lane
Shere
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU5 9HS
- Phone:
- 01483202317
- Email:
- sspc@sherepool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window