PETWORTH HOUSE TENNIS COURT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of Real Tennis. The Charity also promotes the conservation, preservation and improvement for the public benefit as a building of historic interest the Real Tennis Court at Petworth, and education of the public about the history and heritage of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEREWARD CHARLES TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hugo Taylor | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim James | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ramon Fuente | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard McNally | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jon Edward Petersen | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Walter Page | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wallace Muir | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN AYSCOUGH WILKINSON | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
SIMON FAIRFAX KNIGHT DL | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ALAN SHERITON SWAN | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
David Brook Fortune | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GORDON HELM DRAFFAN | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.23k | £93.56k | £82.56k | £82.10k | £94.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.01k | £74.89k | £58.14k | £68.97k | £92.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 OCT 2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF REAL TENNIS IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND. 2.TO CONSERVE,PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC INTEREST THE REAL TENNIS COURT AT ESTATE YARD, PETWORTH, WEST SUSSEX GU28 0DU, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE BUILDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Estate Yard
Petworth
GU28 0DU
- Phone:
- 01798343527
- Email:
- phtc@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window