Eye Foundation of UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is a medical charity providing affordable and accessible medical eye care focussing on management for avoidable blindness by conducting clinics for diagnosis and treatment of eye conditions. Done in resource poor countries. In addition to hands on work on patients, it also aims at funding related projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
- Egypt
- Ghana
- India
- Nepal
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
Governance
- 27 April 2020: CIO registration
- Eye Foundation of UK (Working name)
- EYE FOUNDATION OF AMERICA (UK) (Previous name)
- EYE FOUNDATION OF AMERICA, UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Vadrevu Kama Raju FRCS, MD | Chair | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Radhika Misro | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KOPPADA RAJARATNAM | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Aswini Kumar Misro MS,FACS | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £720 | £0 | £125 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2020 as amended on 19 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF VISUAL AND OPTICAL ILLNESS AND IMPAIRMENT, AND THE ELIMINATION OF AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING AFFORDABLE AND ACCESSIBLE MEDICAL EYE CARE AND TREATMENT 3.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT AND THE FACILITATION OF TECHNOLOGICAL ADVANCES RELATING TO SUCH MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 3.3 TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
247 NORTH APPROACH
WATFORD
WD25 0ET
- Phone:
- 01772348314
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window