HASTINGS COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HCT provides accessible and affordable transport for anyone who has difficulties in accessing public transport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE, FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF HASTINGS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window