ELEMENT CREATIVE PROJECTS CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Element runs arts projects with students, and young people leaving care. Our projects promote social connection, emotional wellbeing, and improve confidence. Projects end with a showcase of artwork. We also provide an alumni network through which young people maintain friendships, attend cultural events, and access further opportunities. Formerly Element Creative Projects CIC, running since 06/16.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £22,134 from 4 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 June 2020: CIO registration
- 24 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 24 April 2025: Funds transferred to 200051 ESMEE FAIRBAIRN FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.77k | £215.12k | £198.98k | £260.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.50k | £155.13k | £220.35k | £330.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.76k | £48.14k | £24.10k | £22.13k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), YOUNG PEOPLE, LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN, CARE LEAVERS, AND STUDENTS AT RISK OF EXCLUSION, UP TO THE AGE OF 25, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF AN ARTISTIC AND EDUCATIONAL NATURE PLUS OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION; C. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window