THE ARTS HAVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide a network group that encourages and enables people to engage with the arts world and the public, increase and coordinate opportunities for people to participate more effectively in the arts, provide information to support and enable people to maximise their artistic opportunities, provide workshops, forums, advocacy and general support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Gloucestershire
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 November 2019: CIO registration
- ARTS HAVEN (Working name)
- ARTS-HAVEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Prytherch | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Pearson | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Utterson | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £430 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £580 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DANCE, MUSIC, MEDIA, THEATRE, VISUAL ART AND CRAFTS), BY MAKING IT ACCESSIBLE TO ALL THROUGH PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, DISPLAYS, WORKSHOPS, FESTIVALS OR SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD COAL WHARF
THE PLANTATION
CROPREDY
BANBURY
The Plantation
OX17 1PN
- Phone:
- +447886915151
- Email:
- contact@arts-haven.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window