THE GOGARTH PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parents, Teacher and Friends Association is a social, fundraising and support network consisting of parents, staff and friends of the school. The object of the charity is: " To advance the education of pupils at Ysgol y Gogarth by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities (not required to be provided by the Local Educational Authority) for education at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
Governance
- 27 January 2020: Standard registration
- GOGARTH PFSA CHARITY (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Odine Matscheroth | Chair | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Curle | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VICTORIA KENYON | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lowri Angharad Williams | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janine Tennant Jones | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edna May Buxton | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dawson | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.55k | £4.85k | £11.08k | £28.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £384 | £1.89k | £25.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT YSGOL Y GOGARTH BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Gogarth
Nant y Gamar Road
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1YE
- Phone:
- 0300 456 9521
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window