SHRI GURU RAVIDASS CULTURAL ASSOCIATION DARLASTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance religion through the promotion of the teachings of Shri Guru Ravidass Ji and to provide a place of worship according to his teaching, to advance the education of the inhabitants of Darlaston by the promotion of the culture, language and traditions of Shri Guru Ravidass Ji & to promote facilities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Darlaston in the interest of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Walsall
Governance
- 09 January 1984: Standard registration
- SHRI GURU RAVIDASS CULTURAL ASSOCIATION DARLASTON (Working name)
- RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY CENTRE, DARLASTON (Previous name)
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajesh Jassal | Chair | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jarnail Singh | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAM KISHAN MEHMI | Trustee | 28 February 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.17k | £23.94k | £72.43k | £94.98k | £88.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.35k | £20.37k | £29.36k | £26.83k | £36.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 October 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 04 October 2024 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 May 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/12/1983 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE RELIGION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHINGS OF SRI GURU RAVIDASS JI AND TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP ACCORDING TO HIS TEACHINGS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INHABITANTS OF DARLASTON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RAVIDASSI COMMUNITY, IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, CREED, CULTURE, RELIGION OR SEX, BY THE PROMOTION OF CULTURE, LANGUAGE AND TRADITIONS OF SRI GURU RAVIDASS JI; (3) TO PROMOTE FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DARLASTON IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHRI GURU RAVIDASS TEMPLE
37-38 PINFOLD STREET
DARLASTON
WEST MIDLANDS
WS10 8SY
- Phone:
- 0771 378 9237
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window