THE FRIENDS OF ASTON'S EYOT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting wildlife and public access to Aston's Eyot, a former rubbish tip turned nature reserve in East Oxford, through increasing biodiviersity (habitat management) and path maintenance. Also involving local residents in wildlife events - dawn chorus and plant identification walks, moth trapping, bat detecting and volunteer work parties involving planting, scything, litter picking etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anthony Stephen Cheke | Chair | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence White Burrell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Elizabeth Ashcroft | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Stally-Chudasama | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Jakobsson Thomas | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ellis | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Lynne Martin | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/09/2020 | 26/09/2021 | 26/09/2022 | 26/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15k | £3.27k | £7.75k | £16.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £1.40k | £7.33k | £7.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING BIODIVERSITY, OF ASTON'S EYOT, THE AREA OF OXFORD BOUNDED BY THE RIVERS THAMES AND CHERWELL AND THE SHIRELAKE DITCH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) CARRYING OUT WORK TO PROTECT, CARE FOR AND MANAGE OR ASSIST IN MANAGING THE SITE AS A HABITAT FOR WILDLIFE AND AS A WILD AREA. B) SURVEYING AND RECORDING SPECIES OF FAUNA AND FLORA PRESENT, DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE SURVEYS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. C) INVOLVING THE WIDER PUBLIC IN ACTIVITIES SUCH AS WORKING PARTIES, WILDLIFE EVENTS, PATH MAINTENANCE AND OTHER EVENTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OR OTHER EVENTS ACCEPTABLE TO THE LANDOWNERS WITH THEIR PERMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OXFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
139 HURST STREET
OXFORD
OX4 1HE
- Phone:
- 01865248344
- Email:
- info@friendsofastonseyot.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window