SAFEHANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SafeHands works to see a world where women and girls have the information to make full, free and informed choices over their sexual and reproductive health and rights. We use multimedia communication to put sexual and reproductive health and rights information into the hands of women and girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Uganda
Governance
- 19 November 2019: CIO registration
- 07 November 2023: Funds received from 1097928 SAFEHANDS FOR MOTHERS CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 April 2025: Funds transferred to
- 17 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £232.23k | £163.86k | £293.57k | £48.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £277.20k | £259.38k | £206.71k | £147.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, THE MEDICAL PROFESSION, MIDWIVES, HEALTH WORKERS AND ALL OTHERS CONCERNED WITH REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH (WHETHER OR NOT PROFESSIONALLY TRAINED OR QUALIFIED) ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH INCLUDING CHILDBIRTH AND SAFE MOTHERHOOD AND THE MEANS BY WHICH THESE MAY BE MOST EFFECTIVELY FACILITATED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window