EGGLESTON AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running Eggleston Agricultural Show
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 04 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM WILKINSON | Chair | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Robinson | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Stainsby Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Roy Oxby | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GENT | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £33.42k | £36.89k | £27.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £24.42k | £30.99k | £31.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND RURAL CRAFTS AND SKILLS IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK AND THE DEMONSTRATION AND SHOWING OF LIVESTOCK, MACHINERY, CRAFTS, PRODUCTS, METHODS AND PROCESSES CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTURE AND AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE HOLDING OF AN ANNUAL SHOW. B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UTASS
9-11 CHAPEL ROW
MIDDLETON-IN-TEESDALE
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 0SN
- Phone:
- 01751432529
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window